NY A07458 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.564
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.564
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to long term care ombudsman access to assisted living facilities.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to long term care ombudsman access to assisted living facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.564 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7458 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to aging |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1102 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGING |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5780 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.169 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S05780 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.564