NY A07462 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Ensures that the provisions governing liquor licenses are consistent with respect to public interest factors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensures that the provisions governing liquor licenses are consistent with respect to public interest factors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.552
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-06Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S02360 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback