NY A07467 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that medical marihuana may be used as part of the treatment of a patient's condition and removes the "serious" designation of such condition; provides that a practitioner be authorized to prescribe controlled substances in the state and removes the requirement that a physician prescribe such medical marihuana; increases the supply amount of marihuana from thirty to sixty days; allows a designated caregiver facility or designated caregiver facility employee to possess, acquire, deliver, transfer, transport or administer medical marihuana; requires the commissioner of health to establish a medical marihuana research license; establishes a medical marihuana research program; requires the registration of designated caregiver facilities; authorizes the commissioner of health to approve and permit one or more independent laboratories to test medical marihuana; increases the number of dispensing sites of a registered organization from four to eight; and makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that medical marihuana may be used as part of the treatment of a patient's condition and removes the "serious" designation of such condition; provides that a practitioner be authorized to prescribe controlled substances in the state and removes the requirement that a physician prescribe such medical marihuana; increases the supply amount of marihuana from thirty to sixty days; allows a designated caregiver facility or designated caregiver facility employee to possess, acquire, deliver, transfer, transport or administer medical marihuana; requires the commissioner of health to establish a medical marihuana research license; establishes a medical marihuana research program; requires the registration of designated caregiver facilities; authorizes the commissioner of health to approve and permit one or more independent laboratories to test medical marihuana; increases the number of dispensing sites of a registered organization from four to eight; and makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | print number 7467a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05657 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE