NY A07470 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the preparation of educational materials relating to substance abuse among students and designating employees to provide information regarding substance abuse to students, parents and staff.
Title
Relates to the preparation of educational materials relating to substance abuse among students and designating employees to provide information regarding substance abuse to students, parents and staff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Senate | signed chap.323 |
2018-10-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1073 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8318 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.521 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.401 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.401 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S08318 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7470