NY A07476 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.710
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.710
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to audits by the state comptroller of certain organizations directly or indirectly controlled by municipal corporations and certain other government entities.
Title
Relates to audits by the state comptroller of certain organizations directly or indirectly controlled by municipal corporations and certain other government entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.710 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.283 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7476 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.801 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5445 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.283 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.283 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05445 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.710