NY A07492 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to coverage and billing procedures in the Medicaid program for complex rehabilitation technology for patients with complex medical needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to coverage and billing procedures in the Medicaid program for complex rehabilitation technology for patients with complex medical needs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1399
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5741
2019-05-29SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-05-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.444
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-07Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S05741 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7492

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07492&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07492&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07492
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07492&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07492&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07492&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7492#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback