NY A07494 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Describes the role of the ignition interlock monitor as well as requirements of people charged with violations that require the installation of an ignition interlock device to comply with court orders.
Title
Describes the role of the ignition interlock monitor as well as requirements of people charged with violations that require the installation of an ignition interlock device to comply with court orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7494a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05671 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to transportation