NY A07500 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6395
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to judgment by confession; allows a government agency engaged in the enforcement of a civil or criminal law to file an affidavit in any county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to judgment by confession; allows a government agency engaged in the enforcement of a civil or criminal law to file an affidavit in any county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6395
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.395
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.395
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-30Assemblyprint number 7500a
2019-05-30Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2019-05-07Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06395 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07500&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07500&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07500
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07500&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07500A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07500&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07500&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07500&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback