NY A07502 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to injunctive relief in improper practice cases, in relation to extending the effectiveness of provisions contained therein.
Title
Relates to injunctive relief in improper practice cases, in relation to extending the effectiveness of provisions contained therein.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.64 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.927 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5831 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.445 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05831 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.64