NY A07504 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes gas stations to purchase motor fuel from alternative suppliers.
Title
Authorizes gas stations to purchase motor fuel from alternative suppliers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | print number 7504a |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2011-05-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |