NY A07506 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - substituted by s5540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of general services to place a POW/MIA chair and plaque in the capitol to honor United States prisoners of war and those still missing in action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of general services to place a POW/MIA chair and plaque in the capitol to honor United States prisoners of war and those still missing in action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14Assemblysubstituted by s5540
2017-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.237
2017-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.237
2017-06-13Assemblyreported
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-04-28Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05540 (Same As) 2017-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.407

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback