NY A07512 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the ethical standards for state agency contractors act.
Title
Establishes the ethical standards for state agency contractors act.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
A07506 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - enacting clause stricken