NY A07518 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.523
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.523
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the date of adjustment and amount of the spousal maintenance cap; increases the income cap to $84,000 of the payor's annual income.
Title
Relates to the date of adjustment and amount of the spousal maintenance cap; increases the income cap to $84,000 of the payor's annual income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.523 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.446 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a7518 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.706 |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s5515 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.446 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05515 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.523