NY A07525 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the small claims court jurisdiction amount to no more than ten thousand dollars in the New York city civil courts.
Title
Increases the small claims court jurisdiction amount to no more than ten thousand dollars in the New York city civil courts.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.664 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1717 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6417 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.449 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06417 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - signed chap.664