NY A07526 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - ordered to third reading cal.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - ordered to third reading cal.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the content of a summons with notice in certain actions.
Title
Relates to the content of a summons with notice in certain actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.275 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | substituted for a7526 |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.147 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1068 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | substituted by s5574 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.275 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.450 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05574 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - ordered to third reading cal.275