NY A07531 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to home improvement contract provisions.
Title
Relates to home improvement contract provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.550 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.285 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7531 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1282 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s1405 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.285 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.285 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01405 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.550