NY A07539 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs; provides that no person shall operate a vessel while such person has .18 of one per centum or more by weight of alcohol in such person's blood as shown by chemical analysis of such person's blood, breath, urine or saliva.
Title
Relates to operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs; provides that no person shall operate a vessel while such person has .18 of one per centum or more by weight of alcohol in such person's blood as shown by chemical analysis of such person's blood, breath, urine or saliva.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05398 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S06405 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S06405 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION