NY A07540 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to regulatory penalties for small businesses; provides that upon an initial violation of a state agency's rules or regulations, a small business shall be afforded a cure period or other opportunity for ameliorative action, which if successful shall prevent the imposition of a fine or fines.
Title
Relates to regulatory penalties for small businesses; provides that upon an initial violation of a state agency's rules or regulations, a small business shall be afforded a cure period or other opportunity for ameliorative action, which if successful shall prevent the imposition of a fine or fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | approval memo.78 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.731 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1349 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5815C |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.396 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.396 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7540b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7540a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to small business |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S05815 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - approval memo.78