NY A07542 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates sheriffs, under-sheriffs and deputy sheriffs of the city of New York as police officers.
Title
Designates sheriffs, under-sheriffs and deputy sheriffs of the city of New York as police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00373 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08050 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - REFERRED TO CODES
S08050 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - REFERRED TO CODES