NY A07546 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Orchard Park central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Authorizes the Orchard Park central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.306 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.306 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01734 (Same As) 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN