NY A07547 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a quorum of the advisory council on lead poisoning prevention; sets a quorum as a majority of voting membership of the council.
Title
Relates to a quorum of the advisory council on lead poisoning prevention; sets a quorum as a majority of voting membership of the council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.273 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.451 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a7547 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.624 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s5113 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.451 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05113 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.273