NY A07548 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payment of independent contractors and authorizes the department of labor to investigate complaints, make claims for compensation, assess liquid damages, civil penalties and criminal penalties; authorizes the award of attorney fees and liquidated damages; excludes construction contractors.
Title
Relates to payment of independent contractors and authorizes the department of labor to investigate complaints, make claims for compensation, assess liquid damages, civil penalties and criminal penalties; authorizes the award of attorney fees and liquidated damages; excludes construction contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02155 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO LABOR