NY A07553 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the beneficiaries of a member of the state and local employees' retirement system who died after filing a retirement application to choose pension benefits rather than a death benefit.
Title
Authorizes the beneficiaries of a member of the state and local employees' retirement system who died after filing a retirement application to choose pension benefits rather than a death benefit.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | print number 7553b |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7553a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05763 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE