NY A07557 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5317b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5317b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the authorization of county of Chautauqua to impose additional 1/2% sales and use taxes until November 30, 2017; authorizes such county to increase the rate of such taxes to 1%, if county real property taxes are reduced by 3%.
Title
Extends the expiration of the authorization of county of Chautauqua to impose additional 1/2% sales and use taxes until November 30, 2017; authorizes such county to increase the rate of such taxes to 1%, if county real property taxes are reduced by 3%.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5317b |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.673 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | print number 7557a |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05317 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.332