NY A07557 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of the "Cleaner, Greener NY Act of 2013".
Title
Extends the effectiveness of the "Cleaner, Greener NY Act of 2013".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.65 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1586 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6481 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.558 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06481 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.65