NY A07558 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mining in counties with a population of one million or more which draws the primary source of drinking water from a designated sole source aquifer, by prohibiting such activity where contamination to groundwater or drinking water on site or attributable to the site exceeds state or federal drinking water or groundwater standards.
Title
Relates to mining in counties with a population of one million or more which draws the primary source of drinking water from a designated sole source aquifer, by prohibiting such activity where contamination to groundwater or drinking water on site or attributable to the site exceeds state or federal drinking water or groundwater standards.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05652 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION