NY A07559 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the town of Bedford to be used exclusively for the purposes of operating and maintaining a wastewater treatment plant and appurtenant facilities and operations.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the town of Bedford to be used exclusively for the purposes of operating and maintaining a wastewater treatment plant and appurtenant facilities and operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.126 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1632 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8349 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.994 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.403 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.403 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05786 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S08349 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7559
S08349 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7559