NY A07564 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.626
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.626
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a written report on plans and programs related to the prevention of suicide.
Title
Relates to requiring a written report on plans and programs related to the prevention of suicide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.626 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1459 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6406A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.176 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7564b |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7564a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06406 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.626