NY A07568 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to the public library construction grant program to 2023.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to the public library construction grant program to 2023.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Senate | signed chap.192 |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1051 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5603 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.452 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S05603 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - signed chap.192