NY A07571 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.557
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.557
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to raising the value of a small estate from $30,000 to $50,000.
Title
Relates to raising the value of a small estate from $30,000 to $50,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.557 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.178 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7571a |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1066 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4951A |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s4951a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.178 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.178 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | print number 7571a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04951 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.557