NY A07572 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that arbitration awards in consumer and employment disputes, where the arbitration is conducted pursuant to a contract, shall include all issues in dispute and the arbitrator's findings of fact and conclusions of law.
Title
Provides that arbitration awards in consumer and employment disputes, where the arbitration is conducted pursuant to a contract, shall include all issues in dispute and the arbitrator's findings of fact and conclusions of law.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.278 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.179 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.179 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02630 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY