NY A07573 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "veteran" to also include an individual with a DD Form 214, Certificate of Release or Discharge from Active Duty.
Title
Clarifies the definition of "veteran" to also include an individual with a DD Form 214, Certificate of Release or Discharge from Active Duty.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.279 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.453 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S05819 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS