NY A07574 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain non-profit car-sharing organizations from the supplemental tax on passenger car rentals outside of the metropolitan commuter transportation district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain non-profit car-sharing organizations from the supplemental tax on passenger car rentals outside of the metropolitan commuter transportation district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1391
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5582
2019-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.454
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-09Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05582 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7574

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback