NY A07580 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.287
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.287
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Title
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.287 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.287 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | print number 7580b |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7580a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to banks |