NY A07581 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5774
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5774
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes outpatient blood clotting factor products, and other related services and treatments from managed care coverage for medical assistance recipients.
Title
Excludes outpatient blood clotting factor products, and other related services and treatments from managed care coverage for medical assistance recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s5774 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.344 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05774 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - VETOED MEMO.156