NY A07584 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - signed chap.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - signed chap.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sealing petty offenses and making certain technical changes.
Title
Relates to sealing petty offenses and making certain technical changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.359 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1527 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6347 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.455 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06347 (Same As) 2019-10-07 - signed chap.359