NY A07599 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s5731a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s5731a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of overtime ceiling for members who first become members of a public retirement system of the state on or after April first, two thousand twelve.
Title
Relates to the definition of overtime ceiling for members who first become members of a public retirement system of the state on or after April first, two thousand twelve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5731a |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.222 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.222 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | print number 7599a |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05731 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.312