NY A07600 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s5594c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s5594c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.
Title
Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s5594c |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.101 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-02-21 | Assembly | print number 7600c |
2018-02-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | print number 7600b |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | print number 7600a |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05594 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.311