NY A07600 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the permitted submissions in a default judgment, permitting the party entitled to judgment to submit additional proof of damages.
Title
Relates to the permitted submissions in a default judgment, permitting the party entitled to judgment to submit additional proof of damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.627 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1725 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6471 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.560 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06471 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.627