NY A07602 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s5593a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s5593a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes members of the New York state and local employees' retirement system to repay the loan balance at any time.
Title
Authorizes members of the New York state and local employees' retirement system to repay the loan balance at any time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s5593a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.102 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | print number 7602a |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05593 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.426