NY A07605 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to commissions for receivers of rents and profits; provides that generally receivers are entitled to such commissions as the court by which the receiver is appointed allows.
Title
Relates to commissions for receivers of rents and profits; provides that generally receivers are entitled to such commissions as the court by which the receiver is appointed allows.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.282 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.457 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |