NY A07608 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.395
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.395
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.
Title
Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.395 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7608a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05654 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08837 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
S08837 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES