NY A07609 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - print number 7609b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - print number 7609b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to alienate certain lands used as parkland to Russel and Deana Galindo for the purpose of residential improvements and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to alienate certain lands used as parkland to Russel and Deana Galindo for the purpose of residential improvements and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7609b |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | print number 7609a |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |