NY A07610 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.639
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.639
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Alienates certain parklands in the town of Stony Point, county of Rockland, conveyed to said town pursuant to Chapter 851 of the Laws of 1973.
Title
Alienates certain parklands in the town of Stony Point, county of Rockland, conveyed to said town pursuant to Chapter 851 of the Laws of 1973.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.639 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.690 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7610a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5281B |
2019-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-10 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.578 |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5281A |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5281b |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.690 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 7610a |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05281 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.639