NY A07612 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eliminating rent for homeless shelters; provides that a homeless individual or family applying for or receiving temporary housing assistance shall not be required to pay room and board or contribute any earned or unearned income, available benefits or resources to eliminate their need for temporary housing assistance or as a condition to receive temporary housing assistance from such provider.
Title
Relates to eliminating rent for homeless shelters; provides that a homeless individual or family applying for or receiving temporary housing assistance shall not be required to pay room and board or contribute any earned or unearned income, available benefits or resources to eliminate their need for temporary housing assistance or as a condition to receive temporary housing assistance from such provider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | print number 7612a |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to social services |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S06177 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 6177A