NY A07628 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Woodbury, Orange county, to impose, by local law, a tax on hotel and motel occupancy of up to five percent of the per diem rental rate therefor; sets procedures for collection, enforcement, and adjudication; provides for deposit of revenues into the general fund of the town and their application to any lawful purpose; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes the town of Woodbury, Orange county, to impose, by local law, a tax on hotel and motel occupancy of up to five percent of the per diem rental rate therefor; sets procedures for collection, enforcement, and adjudication; provides for deposit of revenues into the general fund of the town and their application to any lawful purpose; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.813 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.274 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.274 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04648 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS