NY A07628 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an interagency council for the purpose of coordinated planning on issues related to older adults which shall assess current programs and services across multiple agencies and shall consider current and projected needs.
Title
Establishes an interagency council for the purpose of coordinated planning on issues related to older adults which shall assess current programs and services across multiple agencies and shall consider current and projected needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.237 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1092 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5999 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.305 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.294 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.294 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | print number 7628a |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S05999 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7628A