NY A07628 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - print number 7628b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - print number 7628b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating an age based school tax relief exemption for those aged sixty-five years or more.
Title
Relates to creating an age based school tax relief exemption for those aged sixty-five years or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Assembly | print number 7628b |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | print number 7628a |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |