NY A07633 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s5924a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s5924a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the taking of sharks; extends provisions for two years.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the taking of sharks; extends provisions for two years.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s5924a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.995 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | print number 7633a |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05924 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.427