NY A07634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Albany to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands, in relation to revising the metes and bounds of the parkland property to be alienated.
Title
Authorizes the city of Albany to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands, in relation to revising the metes and bounds of the parkland property to be alienated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.283 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1161 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5616A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.400 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.400 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 7634a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | reference changed to cities |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05616 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.283